EP2236301 - Recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Shigeki c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Koji c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 03 /
Hibi, Manabu c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 04 /
Osawa, Naokatsu c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Kato, Shigeki c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | ||
02 /
Ito, Koji c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | |||
03 /
Hibi, Manabu c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | |||
04 /
Osawa, Naokatsu c/o Intellectual Property Department Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10156381.5 | 12.03.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | JP20090081291 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009081291 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236301 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2236301 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00, B41J13/08 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
B41J11/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung | [2010/40] | English: | Recording apparatus | [2010/40] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 21.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12151606.6 / EP2444252 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2010 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | IT | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MK | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | SM | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | IE | 12.03.2012 | LU | 12.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
SM | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5821968 (OHYAMA KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 11; figures 7, 8 *; | [Y]JP2001199071 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 60] - [0064]; figure 3 *; | [Y]JP2002046310 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD) [Y] 1-19* paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005128275 (UJI AYAKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034]; figures 2, 3 *; | [X]WO2008078446 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 26, line 7 - page 31, line 22; figures 10-12 * | by applicant | JP2718626B |