EP2191797 - Apparatus for Fallopian tube occlusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adiana, Inc. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrington, Douglas C. Adiana, Inc. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
Carr-Brendel, Victoria E. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 03 /
Bowman, Brett S. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
Harrington, Douglas C. Adiana, Inc. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
02 /
Carr-Brendel, Victoria E. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
03 /
Bowman, Brett S. Suite A, 2684 Middlefield Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/22] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10156384.9 | 28.01.2000 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | US19990241790 | 01.02.1999 Original published format: US 241790 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191797 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191797 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F6/06 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A61F6/225 (EP,US);
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B17/12099 (EP,US);
A61B17/1219 (EP,US);
A61B18/1485 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00559 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Eileiterokklusion | [2010/22] | English: | Apparatus for Fallopian tube occlusion | [2010/22] | French: | Appareil pour l'occlusion des trompes de Fallope | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 06.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00905766.2 / EP1156764 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000905766) is 10.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | GR | 13.01.2012 | LU | 28.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4700701 (MONTALDI DAVID H [US]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5095917 (VANCAILLIE THIERRY G [US]) [AD] 1-15 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 22; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5147353 (EVERETT ROYICE B [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [AD]WO9855046 (ADIANA INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 13, line 24 - page 15, line 16; figures 9,10 * * page 18, line 11 - page 20, line 30; figure 14 * |