EP2210888 - Stable micronized candesartan cilexetil and methods for preparing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [2013/17] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurgan, Ziv 28/7 Itzhak Shatal Street Beer-sheva / IL | 02 /
Pesachovich, Michael 5/11 Zvulun Hammer Str Givat-shmuel / IL | [2013/17] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
Kurgan, Ziv 28/7 Itzhak Shatal Street Beer-sheva / IL | ||
02 /
Pesachovich, Michael 5/11 Zvulun Hammer Str Givat-shmuel / IL | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/30] | Lumsden, Stuart Edward Henry D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10156812.9 | 10.05.2006 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | US20050679952P | 10.05.2005 Original published format: US 679952 P | US20050680115P | 11.05.2005 Original published format: US 680115 P | US20050684455P | 24.05.2005 Original published format: US 684455 P | US20050707417P | 10.08.2005 Original published format: US 707417 P | US20050709954P | 19.08.2005 Original published format: US 709954 P | US20050716995P | 13.09.2005 Original published format: US 716995 P | US20050722388P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 722388 P | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2210888 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2210888 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210888 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/10, A61K31/4184, A61P9/10 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
C07D403/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/141 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Stabiles mikronisiertes Candesartan-Cilexetil und Herstellungsverfahren | [2010/30] | English: | Stable micronized candesartan cilexetil and methods for preparing thereof | [2010/30] | French: | Candesartan cilexetil micronisé stable et son procédé de préparation | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2012 | Observations by third parties | 28.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06759583.5 / EP1763525 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060759583) is 04.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2006 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | IE | 10.05.2013 | LU | 10.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GB | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GB | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5196444 (NAKA TAKEHIKO [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * Abstract; claims; working example 7; experimental example 1; figure 3. *; | [A]WO0067892 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract; claims 1, 21; page 11, lines 23-31 and figures 11b, 12b. *; | [XP]WO2005111021 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [XP] 1-14 * Abstract; claims; examples 1 and 2. *; | [E]WO2006122254 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1763525 (TEVA PHARMA [IL]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XD] - MATSUNAGA ET AL., "Solid-state characterization of candesartan cilexetil (TCV-116): crystal structure and molecular mobility", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (199902), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 182 - 186, XP002957606 [XD] 1-5 * Pages 182-183, section "Preparation of Polymorphs and Amorphous Form"; page 183, chart 2 and section "Thermal Analysis"; page 184, figure 2 and table 2. * | [X] - Rote Liste Service GmbH (editor), Rote Liste 2004, Aulendorf, Editio Cantor Verlag, (2004), XP002594024 [X] 1-5,12-14 * Entries 17154 (Atacand Tabletten) and 17155 (Blopross Tabletten). * | [A] - BLACK ET AL., "Laser-based techniques for particle-size measurement: a review of sizing methods and their industrial applications", PROGRESS IN ENERGY AND COMBUSTION SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 22, no. 3, ISSN 0360-1285, pages 267 - 306, XP004068954 [A] 1-14 * Chapters 2.1, 2.2, 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0360-1285(96)00008-1 | [A] - Malvern Instruments, MAN 0101 Issue 1.3 - Getting Started Manual for Mastersizer X and Mastersizer S., Malvern (UK), Malvern Instruments Ltd., (199708), XP002594025 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | - Malvern Instruments: "Mastersizer S, User Manual MAN 0096 Issue 1.0", November 1994, Malvern Instruments Ltd., Malvern (UK), chapter 2, pages 11-13, chapter 8, pages 87-90. | - Zeng, "Particulate Analysis - Particle Size", Zeng, Storey, Ymen (eds.), Solid State Characterization of Pharmaceuticals, Chichester, John Wiley & Sons, (20110531), pages 388 - 425, Chapter 11, ISBN 9781405134941 | - Rawle: Technical Paper - Basic Principles of Particle Size Analysis, Malvern Intruments, pages 1-8. | - US Pharmacopoeia, vol 23 (1995), chapter 941: x-ray diffraction, pages 1843-1844. | - Connolly: Introduction to X-ray Powder Diffraction, 2007, pages 1-9. Accessible from the internet under: http://epswww.unm.edu/xrd/xrdclass/01-XRD-Intro.pdf | by applicant | US5196444 | - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1999), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 182 - 186 | other | - THIBERT R. ET AL, "Micronization of Pharmaceutical Solids", MML SERIES, (1999), vol. 1, pages 327 - 347, XP003028691 | - "ARL X'TRA diffraktometer (Press release attached)", LABO ONLINE, pages 1 - 6, XP003028692 | - V. ALEXEEV, Analise Quantitativa, 3rd Ed. (English translation enclosed), LIVRARIA LOPES DA SILVA, (1983), pages 97 - 98, XP003028693 |