EP2230676 - Coil component, transformer, switching power supply unit, and method for manufacturing coil component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 3-9-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 3-9-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8272 / JP | ||
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikezawa, Akira c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2010/38] | 01 /
Ikezawa, Akira c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/49] |
Former [2010/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10156822.8 | 18.03.2010 | [2010/38] | Priority number, date | JP20090068200 | 19.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009068200 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2230676 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2230676 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2230676 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H01F27/2847 (EP,US);
H01F2027/2861 (EP,US);
H01F27/303 (EP,US);
H01F27/306 (EP,US);
H01F27/327 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2010/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Spulenkomponente, Transformator, Schalterstromversorgungseinheit und Herstellungsverfahren für die Spulenkomponente | [2010/38] | English: | Coil component, transformer, switching power supply unit, and method for manufacturing coil component | [2010/38] | French: | Composant de bobine, transformateur, unité d'alimentation électrique de commutation et procédé de fabrication du composant de bobine | [2010/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2010 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | GB | 18.03.2018 | IE | 18.03.2018 | LU | 18.03.2018 | MT | 18.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 18.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 18.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 18.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 18.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 18.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 18.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000173840 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS, et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0020]; figure 5 *; | [X]JP2003124040 (NEC TOKIN CORP) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0031] *; | [X]US2004070480 (NAKASHIMA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043]; figures 6-9 * * paragraph [0001] *; | [X]EP1536436 (PREMO SA [ES]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] *; | [X]WO2007132558 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] *; | [XPL]DE112007001155T (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [XP] 1,7 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 1-3 *[L] | by applicant | JP2001073840 | JP2003124040 | US2004070480 | EP1536436 | JP2005217311 | WO2007132558 |