EP2241508 - Work station of a blister packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MPS Maschinen & Pack-Systeme AG Langackerstrasse 29 6330 Cham / CH | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolz, Kurt Hasenbühlstrasse 42 8910 Affoltern am Albis / CH | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Clarence Paul Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Feldmann, Clarence Paul Schneider Feldmann AG Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10156926.7 | 18.03.2010 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | CH20090000599 | 15.04.2009 Original published format: CH 5992009 | [2010/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2241508 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2241508 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B59/04, B29C31/00, B29C33/30, // B65B9/06 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
B65B59/04 (EP);
B29C31/006 (EP);
B29C51/26 (EP);
B65B9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Arbeitsstation einer Blisterverpackungsmaschine | [2010/42] | English: | Work station of a blister packaging machine | [2010/42] | French: | Station de travail d'une machine de conditionnement sous blister | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0895933 (MULTIVAC HAGGENMUELLER KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8-11,13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012]; figure 25 * [A] 3,4; | [Y]US7340871 (SHACKELFORD DARYL W [US], et al) [Y] 1,13 * column 11, line 13 - column 12, line 9; figures 14-15 *; | [Y]US5940953 (ARENDS ALBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,9 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 11 *; | [Y]DE3801032 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US4773839 (CASE CHARLES B [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 4954; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9426509 (ISAP OMV GROUP SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1524087 |