EP2246121 - Conveyor for a powder/gas mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Impellis GmbH & Co. KG Oberflächentechnik Am Försterberg 12 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Uwe Am Försterberg 12 32805, Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Kai Donatusstrasse 1 52078 Aachen / DE | [2010/44] | Application number, filing date | 10157649.4 | 24.03.2010 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | DE20091016095 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009016095 | [2010/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2246121 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/14, B65G53/28, B65G53/52, G01F11/08, B65G53/54, F04B43/00, F04B43/113 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
B05B7/1459 (EP);
F04B15/02 (EP);
F04B43/0072 (EP);
G01F11/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Förderer für ein Pulver-/Gasgemisch | [2010/44] | English: | Conveyor for a powder/gas mixture | [2010/44] | French: | Transporteur pour un mélange poudre/gaz | [2010/44] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2008098854 (Z G CAMINI INOX S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10,14,15 * page 3, line 19 - page 8, line 10 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 8; figures 1-3 * * page 9, lines 8-27; figure 6 * [Y] 9,12,13; | [XI]FR1175431 (SAINRAPT ET BRICE ETS) [X] 1,3,5,6,10,11 * page 3; figures 5-7 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US3007416 (CHILDS WILLIAM S) [X] 1,3-5,7,10 * the whole document * [I] 2; | [YD]DE10353968 (ITW GEMA AG [CH]) [YD] 9,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE602004008632T (GEICO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10353968 |