EP2198867 - Pyrimidine-based compounds useful as GSK-3 inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choquette, Deborah 17 Blakely Road Medford, MA 02155 / US | 02 /
Davies, Robert J 65 Orient Avenue Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
Wannamaker, Marion W 375 Harvard Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10158386.2 | 09.12.2002 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | US20010338857P | 07.12.2001 Original published format: US 338857 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198867 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, C07D239/94, A61P35/00, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D417/12, C07D413/12, C07D409/12, C07D401/04, C07D409/04, C07D495/04, C07D471/04, C07D475/00, A61K31/519 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D239/94 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | Pyrimidinderivate als GSK-3-Inhibitoren | [2010/25] | English: | Pyrimidine-based compounds useful as GSK-3 inhibitors | [2010/25] | French: | Composés à base de pyrimidine utiles en tant qu'inhibiteurs de GSK-3 | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 01.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 15.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02799913.5 / EP1474147 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020799913) is 07.10.2005 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3506665 (KIM DONG H, et al) [X] 1-27 * claims 1,5,9 *; | [X]EP0826673 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-27,29-39 * claims 1,18-23 * * examples 63,204 *; | [X]WO9809960 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-27,29-39 * claim 1 * * examples 13,47,49 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO9965897 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-39 * claim - * * example - *; | [Y]WO0144206 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-39 * claim - * * example - *; | [Y]WO0144246 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-39 * claim - * * example - *; | [YP]WO0222605 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [YP] 1-39 * claim - *; | [XP]WO02053557 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [XP] 1-27,29-39 * claims 1,14 * * page 49 - page 50 * * page 65 - page 72 * * page 108 - page 109 * * page 122 - page 123 * * page 125 - page 128 *; | [XP] - CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICES COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20021111), XP002232960 [XP] 1-27 * order numbers: RDR03878; RDR03879; RDR03877; RDR03876; RDR03874; RDR03871; RDR03870; RH 02109 * | [X] - VAN MUIJLWIJK-KOEZEN ET AL, "Isoquinoline and Quinazoline Urea Analogues as Antagonists for the Human Adenosine A3 Receptor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20000601), vol. 43, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2227 - 2338, XP002147879 [X] 1-27,29-39 * page 2227, column 1 * * page 2230 - page 2231; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000002u | [X] - KOMKOV, A. V. ET AL, "5-Acetyl-6-amino-4-(methylthio)-2-phenylpyrimidine and its use in the synthesis of functionalized pyrido[2,3-d]pyrimidines and pyrimido[4,5-d]pyrimidines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1995), Database accession no. 124:117226, URL: STN, XP002232961 [X] 1-27 * abstract * | by applicant | US3506665 | EP0826673 | WO9809960 | WO9965897 | WO0038675 | WO0144206 | WO0144246 | WO0222605 | WO02053557 | - LOVESTONE ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 1077 - 86 | - BROWNLEES ET AL., NEUROREPORT, (1997), vol. 8, pages 3251 - 55 | - ZHONG ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 395, pages 698 - 702 | - TAKASHIMA ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7789 - 93 | - PEI ET AL., J. NEUROPATHOL. EXP, (1997), vol. 56, pages 70 - 78 | - WANG ET AL., BRAIN RES, (2000), vol. 859, pages 381 - 5 | - SASAKI ET AL., NEUROL RES, (2001), vol. 23, pages 588 - 92 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 32985 - 32991 | - VAN MUIJLWIK-KOETZEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20000601), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 2227 - 2338 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 124:117226 |