EP2233582 - Nucleic acid sequencing by performing successive cycles of duplex extension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Advanced Genetic Analysis Corporation 500 Cummings Center Suite 2450 Beverly MA 01915 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McKernan, Kevin 10 Manley Street Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | 02 /
Blanchard, Alan 4 Campbell Road Middletown, MA 01949 / US | 03 /
Kotler, Lev 6 Radcliff Road, 3 Allston, MA 02134 / US | 04 /
Costa, Gina 6970 Corte Langosta Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Grund, Martin GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158887.9 | 01.02.2006 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | US20050649294P | 01.02.2005 Original published format: US 649294 P | US20050656599P | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 656599 P | US20050673749P | 21.04.2005 Original published format: US 673749 P | US20050699541P | 15.07.2005 Original published format: US 699541 P | US20050722526P | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 722526 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233582 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B82Y15/00 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2531/137, C12Q2525/113, C12Q2565/30 (EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/102, C12Q2533/107, C12Q2537/165 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | Nukleinsäuresequenzierung durch schrittweise Duplexverlängerung | [2010/39] | English: | Nucleic acid sequencing by performing successive cycles of duplex extension | [2010/39] | French: | Sequencage nucléotidique comprenant des cycles sucessifs de fromation duplex | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06720226.7 / EP1844162 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060720226) is 18.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9527080 (LYNX THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. Figs. and claims *; | [AD]WO9321340 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [AD] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [A]WO9633205 (SPECTRAGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [A]US6306597 (MACEVICZ STEPHEN C [US]) [A] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims and figs. *; | [A]WO9831836 (HYSEQ INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [AD] - MAG M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND SELECTIVE CLEAVAGE OF AN OLIGODEOXYNYCLEOTIDE CONTAINING A BRIDGED INTERNUCLEOTIDE 5'-PHOSPHOROTHIOATE LINKAGE", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1991), vol. 19, no. 7, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1437 - 1441, XP000857921 [AD] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. p.1439, 1. col. ff. * | by applicant | US4863849 | US5302509 | WO9106678 | WO9321340 | US6255475 | US6309836 | US6613513 | US6210891 | US6258568 | US5202231 | WO9960170 | WO0056937 | US5740341 | US6306597 | US6406848 | US6268490 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4965188 | WO2005042781 | WO2005082098 | US6489103 | US5830663 | US2004253731 | WO2005010145 | US5705628 | US5898071 | US6534262 | US5665572 | US6511803 | US6844028 | US6632655 | US5641658 | WO0018957 | WO0039587 | US5744305 | US5800992 | US6646243 | WO2004029586 | WO03065038 | WO03040410 | US2003068629 | US5604097 | US6632609 | US5188934 | US4855225 | US6664079 | US2003104437 | WO2004018497 | WO03048387 | WO2005021786 | US6654505 | WO9853300 | - SANGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1977), vol. 74, pages 5463 - 5467 | - MAXAM; GILBERT, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1977), vol. 74, pages 560 - 564 | - VENTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 291, pages 1304 - 1351 | - LANDER ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 860 - 921 | - CANARD ET AL., GENE, (1994), vol. 148, pages 1 - 6 | - METZKER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4259 - 4267 | - FRANçA ET AL., QUARTERLY REVIEWS OF BIOPHYSICS, (2002), vol. 35, pages 169 - 200 | - DRMANAC ET AL., ADVANCES IN BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING/BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 77, pages 76 - 101 | - STEPHAN ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 86, pages 255 - 267 | - P. KONG THOO LIN.; D.M. BROWN, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 10373 - 10383 | - D.M. BROWN; P. KONG THOO LIN, CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 216, pages 129 - 139 | - LOAKES, D.; BROWN, D. M., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4039 - 4043 | - OHTSUKA, E. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, no. 5, pages 2605 - 2608 | - LIN, P.K.T.; BROWN, D. M., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, no. 19, pages 5149 - 5152 | - NICHOLS, R. ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 369, no. 6480, pages 492 - 493 | - RAHMON, M. S.; HUMAYUN, N. Z., MUTATION RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 377, no. 2, pages 263 - 268 | - BERGER, M. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, no. 15, pages 2911 - 2914 | - AMOSOVA, O. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 1930 - 1934 | - LOAKES, D., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 2437 - 2447 | - KOSHKIN, AA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1998), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - SINGH, SK ET AL., CHEM. COMM., (1998), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456 | - SHENDURE, J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, no. 5741, pages 1728 - 1732 | - SCIENCEXPRESS, (20050804), URL: www.sciencexpress.org | - DRESSMAN, D. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2003), vol. 100, no. 15, pages 8817 - 8822 | - ANKER, H. S., F.E.B.S. LETT., (1970), vol. 7, page 293 | - CHOULES, G. L.; ZIMM, B. S., ANAL. BIOCHCM., (1965), vol. 13, pages 336 - 339 | - NEFF, J.A. ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1998), vol. 40, page 511 | - PRUD'HOMME, RK ET AL., LANGMUIR, (1996), vol. 12, page 4651 | - PECLEN; SMITH, LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 266 - 271 | - SPEICHER ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 12, pages 368 - 375 | - LEE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCHS, (1992), vol. 20, pages 2471 - 2483 | - SHIMKUS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 2593 - 2597 | - SOUKUP ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CBEM, (1995), vol. 6, pages 135 - 138 | - SHIMIKUS ET AL., DNA, (1986), vol. 5, pages 247 - 255 | - HENNAN; FENN, METH. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 184, pages 584 - 588 | - COOK, AF, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1970), vol. 92, pages 190 - 195 | - CHLADEK, S. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1972), vol. 94, pages 2079 - 2084 | - RYBAKOV, VN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, pages 189 - 201 | - COSSTICK, R.; VYLE, JS, J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1988), pages 992 - 992 | - MAG, M. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 1437 - 1441 | - XU, Y; KOOL, ET, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, no. 13, pages 3159 - 3164 | - COSSTICK, R.; VYLE, JS, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, pages 4693 - 4696 | - COSSTICK, R.; VYLE, JS, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 829 - 835 | - SUN, SG; PICCIRILLI, JA, NUCL NUCL., (1997), vol. 16, pages 1543 - 1545 | - SUN SG ET AL., RNA, (1997), vol. 3, pages 1352 - 1363 | - VYLE, JS ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1992), vol. 33, pages 3017 - 3020 | - LI, X. ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1994), vol. 1, pages 2123 - 22129 | - LIU, XH; REESE, CB, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, pages 925 - 928 | - WEINSTEIN, LB ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 10341 - 10350 | - SABBAGH, G. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 495 - 501 | - MICKLEFIELD, J. CURR. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 8, pages 1157 - 1179 | - DOUBLIE, S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. GEL., (2004), vol. 101, no. 28, pages 10284 - 10289 | - HALTIWANGER, B.M. ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (2000), vol. 345, pages 85 - 89 | - LEVIN, J; DEMPLE, B., NUCL. ACIDS. RES, (1990), vol. 18, no. 17 | - DIZDAROGLU, M. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 32, pages 12105 - 12111 | - HATAHET, Z. ET AL., J. BIOL, CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 18814 - 18820 | - JIANG, D. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 51, pages 32220 - 32229 | - JIANG, D. ET AL., J: BACT., (1997), vol. 179, no. 11, pages 3773 - 3782 | - TCHOU, J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 15318 - 15324 | - HATAHET, Z. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 18814 - 18820 | - BOITEUX, S. ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 5, pages 3177 - 3183 | - JIANG, D. ET AL., J. BACT., (1997), vol. 179, no. 11, pages 3773 - 3782 | - KROKAN, H,E. ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1997), vol. 325, pages 1 - 16 | - FREDERICA ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 29, pages 2353 - 2537 | - KROKAN ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 8935 - 8948 | - YAO, M.; KOW Y.W., J. BIOL CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 30672 - 30673 | - YAO, M.; KOW Y.W., J BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 28609 - 28616 | - HE, B ET AL., MUTAT. RES., (2000), vol. 459, pages 109 - 114 | - HITCHCOCK, T. ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, no. 13 | - MOE, A. ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 31, no. 14, pages 3893 - 3900 | - RADICELLA, JP ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1997), vol. 94, no. 15, pages 8010 - 5 | - LEHMAN, I.R., SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 186, pages 790 - 797 | - LUO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1996), vol. 24, pages 3071 - 3078,3079-3085 | - LUO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1996), vol. 24, pages 3071 - 3079,3079-3085 | US20040978224 | WO1998US05025 | WO1998US09163 | WO1990US05565 |