EP2372388 - A pulse-echo level measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Milltronics Process Instruments Inc. 1954 Technology Drive Peterborough, ON K9J 7B1 / CA | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Robert 82 Edgewood Road Peterborough, ON K9J 6V8 / CA | 02 /
Larocque, Jean-René 1963 Parkwood Circle Peterborough, ON K9J 8E1 / CA | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158920.8 | 01.04.2010 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2372388 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/292, G01S7/527, G01S13/52, G01S13/88, G01S15/52, G01S15/88, G01F23/284, G01F23/296, // G01S13/10, G01S15/10 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP);
G01F23/2962 (EP);
G01S13/52 (EP);
G01S13/88 (EP);
G01S15/52 (EP);
G01S15/88 (EP);
G01S7/2927 (EP);
G01S7/5276 (EP);
G01S13/10 (EP);
G01S15/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Impulsecho-Pegelmessverfahren | [2011/40] | English: | A pulse-echo level measuring method | [2011/40] | French: | Procédé de mesure de niveau par echos d'impulsions | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]EP2093546 (SIEMENS MILLTRONICS PROC INSTR [CA]) [ID] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [YD]US2010019949 (LAROCQUE JEAN-RENE [CA], et al) [YD] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US7046189 (SPANKE DIETMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2093546 | US2010019949 |