EP2238956 - Absorbent core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2020/27] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlucci, Giovanni PROCTER & GAMBLE ITALIA SPA VIA FIERAMOSCA 118 66100, CHIETI / IT | 02 /
Tamburro, Maurizio PROCTER & GAMBLE ITALIA SPA VIA COLOMBO, 10 66020, SAMBUCETO (CHIETI) / IT | 03 /
Di Cintio, Achille PROCTER & GAMBLE ITALIA SPA VIALE MARCONI 179 65126, PESCARA / IT | [2020/27] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
Carlucci, Giovanni PROCTER & GAMBLE ITALIA SPA VIA FIERAMOSCA 118 66100, CHIETI / IT | ||
02 /
Tamburro, Maurizio PROCTER & GAMBLE ITALIA SPA VIA COLOMBO, 10 66020, SAMBUCETO (CHIETI) / IT | |||
03 /
Di Cintio, Achille PROCTER & GAMBLE ITALIA SPA VIALE MARCONI 179 65126, PESCARA / IT | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2020/27] |
Former [2014/32] | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128-130 66020 Sambuceto di S. Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | ||
Former [2010/41] | Veronese, Pancrazio Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130 Sambuceto 66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10159006.5 | 01.04.2010 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | EP20090005266 | 10.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09005266 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238956 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238956 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/536, A61F13/53, A61F13/42, A61F13/15, A61L15/42, A61L15/60 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
A61L15/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53 (KR);
A61F13/15203 (EP,US);
A61F13/536 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (KR);
A61L15/425 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15406 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15414 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530554 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | A61F13/535, A61F13/539, A61F13/534, A61F13/15, A61L15/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2010/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Saugfähiger Kern | [2010/41] | English: | Absorbent core | [2010/41] | French: | Noyau absorbant | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 29.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 29.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 29.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2010 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | IE | 01.04.2021 | LU | 01.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006240229 (EHRNSPERGER BRUNO J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * figures; paragraphs 2, 3, 7, 8, 36, 38, 40, 42, 43, 65, 67, 68, 72, 74, 75-82 *; | [X]US2003181115 (NAGASUNA KINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * figure 4; paragraphs 6, 19, 88, 91-93, 109, 130-132, 248, 249, 284, 287, 288, 290, 292-296, 306, 307, 309, 313 *; | [XA]US5562646 (GOLDMAN STEPHEN A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * abstract; figure 3; column 7, lines 43-50; column 11, lines 4-31, 57-64; column 12, line 13 - column 13, line 51; column 16, lines 50-59; column 18, lines 20-23; column 21, lines 10-11 and table 1 (PHL); column 24, lines 19-20 and 44; column 25, lines 4 and 27; column 26, line 36; column 30, lines 15-16 and 22; column 32, lines 45-47 and 65-67; column 40, lines 40-60; column 48, line 50 - column 50, line 57 * [A] 8; | [X]US2003069359 (TORII KAZUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs 12, 14, 20, 33, 41, 112, 115, 123, 128, 131, 132, 143, 144, 150, 151, 172-174, 178, 185, 241, 247, 248 *; | [A]US2002115969 (MAEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,9,10 * figures 1, 3-6, 9; paragraphs 4-7, 9, 11, 31, 34-37, 54-57, 59,60, 62, 68, 73, 80 *; | [A]US5328935 (VAN PHAN DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8-10 * column 1, lines 7-54; column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 13; column 13, lines 44-52; column 19, line 64 - column 20, line 5; column 20, line 22 - column 21, line 3; column 29, lines 20-47; column 31, lines 27-38; column 32, line 35 - column 33, line 30; column 35, line 44 - column 36, line 20; column 38, lines 39-40 and line 60; column 39, lines 1, 9-14, 26, 33-60; column 40, lines 19-22; column 42, lines 3-10 *; | [A]US2005096435 (SMITH SCOTT J [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]US2007093767 (CARLUCCI GIOVANNI [IT], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs 17, 33, 35, 37 *; | [A]US2007178786 (NAWATA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 8 * paragraphs 2, 7, 11, 13, 30, 31, 40 * | Examination | US5506035 | by applicant | EP1447067 | US3929135 | US4151240 | US4319868 | US4324426 | US4343314 | US4591523 | US4609518 | US4629643 | US4695422 | WO9600548 | US4529739 | US4649164 | JPS6234042 | JPH0260681 | JPH0254362 | US5118719 | US5154713 | US5314420 | US6251960 | US7163966 | US4808637 | JPS5918712 | US4552938 | US4654393 | US4703067 | US5328935 | US5338766 | JPS5613906 | JPS57182331 | JPS57208236 | WO9102552 | WO9324153 | US5002986 | US5300565 | US5140076 | US4732968 | US4742086 | US5354290 | US5403870 | US5985432 | WO2007047598 | WO2007046052 | EP0752892 | - LEGAGNEUX ET AL., JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 107, no. D17, page 4335 | - DOMINE ET AL., JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 112, page F02031 |