EP2372252 - Safety lock for oven doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi Ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eryilmaz, Hasan Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. 353 Sok. No: 182 Kat:3 Daire: 5 Buca 35150, Izmir / TR | 02 /
Yavuz, Cevdet Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. 2041 sk. Flamingo 17 Daire:4 Mavisehir Karsiyaka 35540, Izmir / TR | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 10159072.7 | 05.04.2010 | [2011/40] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2372252 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
F24C15/022 (EP);
E05C3/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschloss für einen Ofen | [2011/40] | English: | Safety lock for oven doors | [2011/40] | French: | Serrure de sécurité pour un four | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0829600 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]US6474702 (MALONE CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004005653 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * | Examination | BE569770 | GB1155137 | by applicant | EP0678710 |