EP2244006 - Optical device, in particular for lighting and/or signalling, for an automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION Propriété Industrielle 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goncalves, Whilk 64, avenue de Choisy 75013, PARIS / FR | 02 /
Pauty, Etienne 17, avenue Simon Bolivar 75019, PARIS / FR | 03 /
Reis, Otavio-Henrique Pr Ant Menck 34 06093090, OSASCO / BR | [2010/43] | Application number, filing date | 10159629.4 | 12.04.2010 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | FR20090052714 | 24.04.2009 Original published format: FR 0952714 | [2010/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2244006 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, F21S8/10 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
F21S43/30 (EP,US);
F21S41/168 (EP);
F21S41/332 (EP);
F21S41/36 (EP,US);
F21S43/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung, insbesondere zur Beleuchtung und/oder Signalisierung für Kraftfahrzeug | [2010/43] | English: | Optical device, in particular for lighting and/or signalling, for an automobile | [2010/43] | French: | Dispositif optique, notamment d'éclairage et/ou de signalisation de véhicule automobile | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 28.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1798132 (BREDSVOLD PAUL A) [X] 1-4,7,9-14 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-12 *; | [X]EP1790906 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1-4,7-10,13,14 * page 1 - page 7; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2004027836 (TAKADA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,14 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP1724519 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-11,14 * column 1 - column 15; figures 1-11 *; | [X]EP1291240 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10,13,14 * column 1 - column 7; figures 1-3 *; | [X]FR2590351 (CIBIE PROJECTEURS [FR]) [X] 1,3-11,13,14 * page 1 - page 10; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2759149 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * page 1 - page 16; figures 1-9 * |