EP2243657 - Device and method for controlling the sliding of a tiltable vehicle seat by detecting the position of its backrest relative to two reference positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foure, Franck 21 avenue Jean Moulin 90000, BELFORT / FR | 02 /
Baltolu, Thomas 27 rue de Brasse 90000, BELFORT / FR | [2012/20] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
Foure, Franck 21 avenue Jean Moulin 90000, BELFORT / FR | ||
02 /
Baltolu, Thomas 27 rue de Brasse 90000, BELFORT / FR | Representative(s) | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel PSA Automobiles SA VEIP - VV1400 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle - LG081 18 Rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2010/43] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle - LG081 18 Rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 10159971.0 | 15.04.2010 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | FR20090052588 | 21.04.2009 Original published format: FR 0952588 | [2010/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243657 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2243657 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/02, B60N2/12, B60N2/20 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
B60N2/0244 (EP);
B60N2/02246 (EP);
B60N2/0272 (EP);
B60N2/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Kontrollieren der Verschiebung eines klappbaren Fahrzeugsitzes durch Ortung der Position dessen Rückenlehne gegenüber zwei Bezugspositionen | [2010/43] | English: | Device and method for controlling the sliding of a tiltable vehicle seat by detecting the position of its backrest relative to two reference positions | [2010/43] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de contrôle du coulissement d'un siège rabattable de véhicule par détection de la position de son dossier par rapport à deux positions de référence | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 02.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2010 | AT | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | IT | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MC | 16.05.2012 | MK | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | SM | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | NO | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | ES | 27.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
MK | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
SM | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
SM | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | |
NO | 16.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2708423 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XAY]EP1470949 (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [XA]FR2907385 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [YA]US2009079248 (KEYSER MARK R [US], et al) |