EP2243596 - Universal key [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schuebo GmbH Johannespfad 34 57223 Kreuztal / DE | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Schünke und Bockmühl Gmbh Johannespfad 12 57223 Kreuztal-kredenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schünke, Hermann Talsperrenstraße 19 57271, Hilchenbach / DE | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 10160048.4 | 15.04.2010 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | DE20092005858U | 21.04.2009 Original published format: DE 202009005858 U | [2010/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243596 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25B13/00, B25B13/48, B25B13/56 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
B25B13/005 (EP);
B25B13/48 (EP);
B25B13/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Universalschlüssel | [2010/43] | English: | Universal key | [2010/43] | French: | Clé universelle | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2834237 (RENOUX KENNETH L) [X] 1-4,8 * the whole document * [Y] 9,11,12 [I] 5-7,10; | [Y]DE20216931U (SCHUENKE UND BOCKMUEHL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE20216931U |