EP2241728 - Apparatus and method for cooling a turbine using heat pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Yang 34 N. Orchard Farms Avenue Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 02 /
Zhang, Hua 211 Traymore Way Greer, SC 29650 / US | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/42] | 01 /
Liu, Yang 34 N. Orchard Farms Avenue Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | ||
02 /
Zhang, Hua 211 Traymore Way Greer, SC 29650 / US | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2015/13] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2010/42] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10160136.7 | 16.04.2010 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | US20090425416 | 17.04.2009 Original published format: US 425416 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2241728 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2241728 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2241728 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/12, F02C7/18, F02C7/12 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
F02C7/185 (EP,US);
F05D2260/208 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung sowie Verfahren zur Kühlung einer Turbine mit Wärmerohren | [2010/42] | English: | Apparatus and method for cooling a turbine using heat pipes | [2010/42] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour refroidissement d'une turbine à l'aide de tubes caloporteurs | [2014/42] |
Former [2010/42] | Appareil et procédé pour refroidissement d'une turbine des tubes caloporteurs | Examination procedure | 08.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 20.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2010 | AT | 25.03.2015 | BE | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | IE | 16.04.2015 | LU | 16.04.2015 | FR | 26.05.2015 | GB | 25.06.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 16.04.2010 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
LU | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.04.2010 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.04.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
FR | 26.05.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | |
NO | 25.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2264539 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 29 - page 10, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US5267608 (COFFINBERRY GEORGE A [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-15 * column 4, line 23 - line 63; figure 1 * [I] 6,11; | [X]US2006225425 (KOBAYASHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0268] * * paragraph [0311]; figures 6,20 *; | [XI]EP2000648 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-2 * [I] 6,11; | [X]EP2003311 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI] - SILVERSTEIN C C, "CAN THE HEAT PIPE MEET GAS TURBINE THERMAL MANAGEMENT CHALLENGES OF THE NEXT CENTURY?", GLOBAL GAS TURBINE NEWS, XX, XX, (19950801), pages 4 - 7, XP000610239 [X] 1-3,7-9,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 4-6,10,11 | Examination | GB2389174 | EP1736650 |