EP2202924 - Methods and apparatus for enhanced delivery of content over a data network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahl, Sten Jorgen 12037 Wooded Vista Lane San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 02 /
Shah, Devarshi Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
Iyer, Bharat Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
Kannan, Prasanna Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
Collins, Bruce 11730 Angelique Street San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2012/36] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
Dahl, Sten Jorgen 12037 Wooded Vista Lane San Diego, CA 92128 / US | ||
02 /
Shah, Devarshi QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
Iyer, Bharat c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
Kannan, Prasanna c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
Collins, Bruce 11730 Angelique Street San Diego, CA 92131 / US | |||
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Dahl, Sten Jorgen 12037 Wooded Vista Lane San Diego, CA 92128 / US | ||
02 /
Shah, Devarshi 7693 Palmilla Drive, 2101 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
Iyer, Bharat c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
Kannan, Prasanna c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
Collins, Bruce 11730 Angelique Street San Diego, CA 92131 / US | Representative(s) | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10160940.2 | 10.04.2006 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | US20050669406P | 08.04.2005 Original published format: US 669406 P | US20050720000P | 23.09.2005 Original published format: US 720000 P | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202924 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2202924 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/801 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
H04L5/0058 (EP,US);
H04L47/80 (KR);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/24 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/801 (EP,US);
H04L47/805 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,US);
H04L47/828 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/60 (EP,US);
H04W28/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur verbesserten Inhaltszustellung über ein Datennetz | [2010/26] | English: | Methods and apparatus for enhanced delivery of content over a data network | [2010/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil confortant la remise des contenus via un reséau informatique | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 23.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06758324.5 / EP1867114 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060758324) is 19.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2006 | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | IE | 10.04.2013 | LU | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02082743 (COWAVE NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 16, line 16 - page 18, line 20; figures 3,16 * * page 35, line 7 - page 36, line 2 * * page 10, line 20 - page 13, line 21; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]WO2004023743 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 4 - page 14, line 17 * * page 31, lines 11-23 ** figures 1-5 * |