EP2251045 - Colored suture construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleflex Medical Incorporated 2917 Weck Drive Durham, NC 27709 / US | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olson, James R. 37 Gulliver Circle Norwich, CT 06360 / US | [2017/35] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
Olson, James R. 37 Gulliver Circle Norwich, CT 06360 / US | Representative(s) | Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/46] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10160985.7 | 26.04.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | US20090172989P | 27.04.2009 Original published format: US 172989 P | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2251045 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2251045 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251045 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L17/10, A61L17/14 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
A61L17/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/06166 (US);
A61B17/04 (US);
A61L17/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
D04C1/02 (EP,US);
D04C1/12 (EP,US);
D07B1/025 (EP,US);
D07B1/148 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06171 (US);
D07B2201/1096 (EP,US);
D07B2201/209 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L17/04, C08L23/06 (US);
D07B2205/2014, D07B2801/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2010/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gefärbte Nahtkonstruktion | [2010/46] | English: | Colored suture construction | [2010/46] | French: | Construction de suture colorée | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2010 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 26.04.2018 | LU | 26.04.2018 | MT | 26.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.04.2010 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005055051 (GRAFTON R DONALD [US]) [X] 1-6,9-14 * page 1, paragraphs 0006-0008,0013 * * page 2, paragraphs 0022,0023 * [I] 7,8,15-17; | [A]US2007135840 (SCHMIEDING JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, paragraphs 0005,0012 ** page 2, paragraph 0027 * |