EP2254051 - Computer system with damaged bios data recovering function and recovering method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASUSTeK Computer Inc. No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou Taipei / TW | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Chih-Shien / No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou, Taipei / TW | [2012/13] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
Lin, Chih-Shien No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou, Taipei / TW | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 10161267.9 | 28.04.2010 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | TW19810016943 | 21.05.2009 Original published format: TW 098116943 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254051 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254051 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
G06F11/1469 (EP,US);
G06F11/1417 (EP,US);
G06F11/1456 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | Computersystem mit Funktion zur Wiederherstellung beschädigter Biosdaten und Wiederherstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/47] | English: | Computer system with damaged bios data recovering function and recovering method thereof | [2010/47] | French: | Système informatique avec fonction de récupération de données de BIOS endommagées et son procédé de récupération | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2010 | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MK | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | SM | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | IE | 28.04.2012 | LU | 28.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
SM | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
LU | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5247659 (CURRAN MICHAEL W B [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, lines 1-68 * * column 4, lines 3-14, 63-68 *; | [X]US5327531 (BEALKOWSKI RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 39-44; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 49 *; | [A]US6473856 (GOODWIN JOEL GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] , [0007] *; | [X]US2009063840 (OGAWA TOMOYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0025] , [0034] , [0035]; figure 2 * |