EP2224619 - Method of determining transmission rate of control response frame for acknowledging data receipt in wireless lan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwon, Chang-yeul 206-1603 Hyundai I'Park 1-cha Apt., Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 446-567, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Yang, Chil-youl 103-2103 Prugio Apt., 910 Dongcheon-dong Yongin-si 448-120, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Cho, Kyung-ik 278-52 Seongsan 1-dong Mapo-gu 121-484, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Shin, Se-young 944-1002 Byuckjeokgol Lotte Apt., Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-726, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
Kwon, Chang-yeul 206-1603 Hyundai I'Park 1-cha Apt., Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 446-567, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Yang, Chil-youl 103-2103 Prugio Apt., 910 Dongcheon-dong Yongin-si 448-120, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Cho, Kyung-ik 278-52 Seongsan 1-dong Mapo-gu 121-484, Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Shin, Se-young 944-1002 Byuckjeokgol Lotte Apt., Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-726, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/35] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 20 Liitle Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10161657.1 | 06.02.2006 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | US20050650172P | 07.02.2005 Original published format: US 650172 P | KR20050016179 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: KR 20050016179 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2224619 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2224619 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2224619 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/22 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
H04W28/22 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W74/08 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,BR,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Übertragungsrate zur response-frame-Steuerung zur Bestätigung von Datenempfang in drahtlosem lokalen Netzwerk | [2010/35] | English: | Method of determining transmission rate of control response frame for acknowledging data receipt in wireless lan | [2010/35] | French: | Procédé destiné à déterminer la vitesse de transmission d'une trame de reponse de commande afin d'accuser réception de données dans un réseau lan sans fil | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06715872.5 / EP1847042 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060715872) is 10.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2006 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | IE | 06.02.2013 | LU | 06.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 06.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1480481 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5909469 (FRODIGH CARL MAGNUS [SE], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2004082356 (WALTON J RODNEY [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 14a,14b *; | [A]US2004141522 (TEXERMAN YOSSI [IL], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0070] * | [A] - MATHIEU LACAGE ET AL, "IEEE 802.11 Rate Adaptation: A Pratical Approach", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SEVENTH ACM SYMPOSIUM ON MODELING, ANALYSIS AND SIMULATION OF WIRELESS AND MOBILE SYSTEMS, MSWIM : OCTOBER 4 - 6, 2004, VENEZIA, ITALY, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, ISBN 978-1-58113-953-2, (20041004), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.marlow.dk/tech/madwifi/lacage04.pdf, (20041004), XP002589208 [A] 1-6 * page 1, column r, line 1 - page 5, column r, line 10 * | [A] - CHEVILLAT P ET AL, "A dynamic link adaptation algorithm for IEEE 802.11a wireless LANs", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS 11-15 MAY 2003 ANCHORAGE, AK, USA; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS], 2003 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (CAT. NO.03CH37441) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030511), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7802-5, pages 1141 - 1145, XP002589207 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1141, column l, line 13 - page 1143, column l, line 6 * * page 1143, column r, line 23 - line 33 * |