EP2383625 - Lighted port [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schellenberg, Amy 455 Phillip Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3XE / CA | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/44] | Phillips, Emily Elizabeth, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Electronics 20 Red Lion Street London, Greater London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10161682.9 | 30.04.2010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383625 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F1/18, H01R13/717 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H01R13/717 (EP);
G06F1/1656 (EP);
G06F1/181 (EP);
H01R13/631 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchteter Anschluss | [2011/44] | English: | Lighted port | [2011/44] | French: | Port éclairé | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2010 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 08.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006044148 (DANIELS FONDA J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * figure 3 * [I] 4-6,11-13; | [X]US2009168435 (WANG SHUN-LUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11,12,14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]DE19525843 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document * [I] 4,5,7,11,12,14; | [I]US2009201243 (BATES ALLEN K [US], et al) [I] 1-5,7-12,14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * figure 2a * |