EP2247066 - High data rate interface with improved link control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Jon James 7436 Augusta Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
Steele, Brain 1074 Iliad Way Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | 03 /
Wiley, George 5740 Brittany Forrest Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
Shekhar, Shashank 1597 Holeman Drive Erie, IN 80516 / US | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
Anderson, Jon James 7436 Augusta Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | ||
02 /
Steele, Brain 1074 Iliad Way Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | |||
03 /
Wiley, George 5740 Brittany Forrest Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
Shekhar, Shashank 1597 Holeman Drive Erie, IN 80516 / US | Representative(s) | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/44] | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10162001.1 | 12.11.2004 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | US20030519833P | 12.11.2003 Original published format: US 519833 P | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247066 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247066 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
H04L12/6418 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/61 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/324 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/40 (KR,US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeits-Datenschnittstelle mit verbesserter Verbindungssteuerung | [2010/44] | English: | High data rate interface with improved link control | [2010/44] | French: | Interface à débit de données élevé dotée d'un contrôle de lien amélioré | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/44] | Interface à débit de données élevé doté d'un contrôle de lien amélioré | Examination procedure | 05.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04810951.6 / EP1692843 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040810951) is 01.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2004 | AT | 26.09.2012 | BE | 26.09.2012 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | IT | 26.09.2012 | NL | 26.09.2012 | PL | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | IE | 12.11.2012 | LU | 12.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | ES | 06.01.2013 | IS | 26.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
LU | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03023587 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0346] * * figures 1-62b *; | [X]US6609167 (BASTIANI VINCENT J [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 5 - column 65, line 6 * * figures 1-44H *; | [A] - VESA, "VESA Plug and Display Standard Version 1.0", VESA, VESA, (19970611), XP002123075 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20010020520 | US20020236657 | US20040860116 |