EP2251749 - Astronomical time switch means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/46] | Astronomical time switch | ||
[2013/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legrand GmbH Am Silberg 14 59494 Soest / DE | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Legrand-BTicino GmbH Am Silberg 14 59494 Soest / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tebrake, Gregor Thomä-Grandweger-Wallstr. 14 59494, Soest / DE | 02 /
Schröer, Carsten Lindenstr. 26 59505, Bad Sassendorf / DE | 03 /
Isenberg, Andreas Halinger Dorfstr. 82 58708, Menden / DE | [2014/04] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
Tebrake, Gregor Thomä-Grandweger-Wallstr. 14 59494, Soest / DE | ||
02 /
Schröer, Carsten Lindenstr. 26 59505, Bad Sassendorf / DE | |||
03 /
Isenberg, Andreas Halinger Dorfstr. 82 58708, Menden / DE | Representative(s) | Reimann, Silke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Backhaus Im Lohfeld 63a 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2010/46] | Hanewinkel, Lorenz Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a 33102 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 10162524.2 | 11.05.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | DE20091025801 | 14.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009025801 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2251749 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2251749 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251749 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G04G15/00, H05B37/02 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G04C23/18 (EP);
G04C23/26 (EP);
G04G15/006 (EP);
H05B47/16 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Astronomische Zeitschaltvorrichtung | [2013/30] | English: | Astronomical time switch means | [2013/30] | French: | Dispositif de minuterie astronomique | [2013/30] |
Former [2010/46] | Astronomische Zeitschaltuhr | ||
Former [2010/46] | Astronomical time switch | ||
Former [2010/46] | Minuterie astronomique | Examination procedure | 14.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2010 | AL | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | NO | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | GB | 11.05.2014 | IE | 11.05.2014 | LU | 11.05.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.05.2010 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.05.2010 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
TR | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.05.2010 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GB | 11.05.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.05.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.05.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]US6011755 (MULHALL JOHN [IE], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,8,9,11-13 * columns 1-6; figures 1-3 * [A] 10 [I] 3,5-7; | [XI]US2008112269 (LAWTON FRANK EDWARD [US]) [X] 1,4,11-13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0010] - [0012] - [0019] - [0028]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5-7; | [I]US2003025400 (HALL CHRISTOPHER R [US]) [I] 1,2,4,8,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0022] , [0024] *; | [A]WO0251012 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 3,7 * pages 9,10; figure 1 * * pages 16,17 * | by applicant | EP0447849 | US4922407 | DE3019279 | DE102004042200 | US6011755 |