EP2252012 - Method and apparatus for providing fast reroute of a multicast packet within a network element to an available port associated with a multi-link trunk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920-2332 / US | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Assarpour, Hamid 55B Mt. Vernon Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10162772.7 | 13.05.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | US20090178011P | 13.05.2009 Original published format: US 178011 P | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252012 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/16 (EP,US);
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L49/201 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung einer Schnellumleitung eines Multicast-Pakets innerhalb eines Netzwerkelements an einen verfügbaren, mit einer Mehrfachverbindungs-Leitung assoziierten Port | [2010/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing fast reroute of a multicast packet within a network element to an available port associated with a multi-link trunk | [2010/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fournir un réacheminement rapide d'un paquet de multidiffusion au sein d'un élément de réseau vers un port disponible associé à un tronc à liaisons multiples | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.09.2019 | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/46] | 08.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 02.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1729461 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0044] * * claim 1 ** figures 1-6 * | Examination | WO0072531 | - ROGER LAPUH DINESH MOHAN NORTEL NETWORKS, "Split Multi-link Trunking (SMLT); draft-lapuh-network-smlt-00.txt", 20021001, (20021001), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015031370 |