EP2253569 - Transfer of stacks of paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kugler-Womako GmbH Schlosserstrasse 15 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Ferdinand Weinbergstrasse 32 72622, Nürtingen / DE | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10162820.4 | 14.05.2010 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | DE20091022247 | 20.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022247 | [2010/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2253569 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2253569 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H15/02, B65H31/30, B65H29/66, B65H31/24, B65H33/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B65H15/02 (EP,US);
B65H29/669 (EP);
B65H31/24 (EP);
B65H31/3045 (EP,US);
B65H33/00 (EP);
B65H39/105 (EP);
B65H5/12 (EP);
B65H2301/333 (EP);
B65H2301/4213 (EP);
B65H2301/42172 (EP);
B65H2301/423 (EP);
B65H2301/44714 (EP);
B65H2301/44718 (EP);
B65H2403/5321 (EP);
B65H2405/54 (EP);
B65H2701/176 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2301/44714, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02, B65H2301/44714, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2301/44714, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2301/44718, B65H2220/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | B65H29/06, B65H5/00, B65H5/12, B65H15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überführung von Papierstapeln | [2010/47] | English: | Transfer of stacks of paper | [2010/47] | French: | Transfert de piles de papier | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3995748 (LOONEY JOHN H) [I] 1,2,7,11,14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0514783 | DE102004030254 | DE10309096 |