EP2256301 - Systems and methods for modifying the performance of a gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2019/03] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewens, David 406 Ridge Circle Greer, SC 29651 / US | 02 /
Wilkes, Kevin 54 Cantera Circle Greenville, SC 29615-6199 / US | 03 /
Long, Christopher Eugene 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 04 /
Ouellet, Noemie Dion 213 Plum Creek Lane Greenville, SC 29607 / US | [2019/03] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Ewens, David 406 Ridge Circle Greer, SC 29651 / US | ||
02 /
Wilkes, Kevin 54 Cantera Circle Greenville, SC 29615-6199 / US | |||
03 /
Long, Christopher Eugene 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | |||
04 /
Ouellet, Noemie Dion 213 Plum Creek Lane Greenville, SC 29607 / US | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2010/48] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10162853.5 | 14.05.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | US20090472927 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: US 472927 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256301 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256301 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256301 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/08, F02C9/28 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
F01D17/08 (EP,US);
F02C9/28 (EP,US);
F05D2260/20 (EP,US);
F05D2270/082 (EP,US);
F05D2270/083 (EP,US);
F05D2270/303 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2010/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System zum Verstellen der Eigenschaften einer Gasturbine | [2010/48] | English: | Systems and methods for modifying the performance of a gas turbine | [2010/48] | French: | Système pour modifier les performances d'une turbine à gaz | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2010 | AL | 16.01.2019 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | ES | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | NO | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | GB | 14.05.2019 | IE | 14.05.2019 | LU | 14.05.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | FR | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.05.2010 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
GB | 14.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.05.2010 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
GB | 14.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
GB | 14.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
GB | 14.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
GB | 14.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1312780 (GOODRICH PUMP & ENGINE CONTROL [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraphs [0007] , [ 0010] * * paragraphs [0018] , [ 0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0041] , [ 0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-2C *; | [A]US2004237537 (MCKELVEY TERENCE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0061] ** figures 1, 3A, 3B *; | [Y]US2009056335 (MYERS GEOFFREY DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0020] * * figures 1-2 * |