EP2253547 - Cigarette packing machine and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D Societa' per Azioni Via Battindarno 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polloni, Roberto Via Lega, 91 47015 Modigliana / IT | 02 /
Spirito, Gilberto Via Spadini, 3 40133 Bologna / IT | 03 /
Foghetti, Claudio Via Unità d' Italia, 32 61025 Montelabbate / IT | 04 /
Negrini, Vladi Via della Salute, 27 40100 Bologna / IT | 05 /
Roffia, Giacomo Via Savena Superiore, 3/A 40061 Minerbio / IT | 06 /
Biondi, Andrea Via Piave, 6 40133 Bologna / IT | 07 /
Fiorentini, Marco Via Monte dei Pini, 8 40043 Marzabotto / IT | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
Polloni, Roberto Via Lega, 91 47015 Modigliana / IT | ||
02 /
Spirito, Gilberto Via Spadini, 3 40133 Bologna / IT | |||
03 /
Foghetti, Claudio Via Unità d' Italia, 32 61025 Montelabbate / IT | |||
04 /
Negrini, Vladi Via della Salute, 27 40100 Bologna / IT | |||
05 /
Roffia, Giacomo Via Savena Superiore, 3/A 40061 Minerbio / IT | |||
06 /
Biondi, Andrea Via Piave, 6 40133 Bologna / IT | |||
07 /
Fiorentini, Marco Via Monte dei Pini, 8 40043 Marzabotto / IT | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/02] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2010/47] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10162898.0 | 15.05.2010 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | IT2009BO00317 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: IT BO20090317 | [2010/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2253547 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2253547 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2253547 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/22, B65B19/28, B65B61/02, B65B61/06, B31B1/88 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B65B19/28 (EP,US);
B65B19/228 (EP,US);
B65B61/02 (EP,US);
B65B61/025 (EP,US);
B65B61/06 (EP,US);
B41M5/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | B65B19/28, B65B61/02, B31B1/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2010/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Maschine und Verfahren zum Verpacken von Zigaretten | [2010/47] | English: | Cigarette packing machine and method | [2010/47] | French: | Machine et procédé pour emballer des cigarettes | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 29.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE Opponent's representative Ellberg, Nils, et al, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE Opponent's representative Ellberg, Nils, et al, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | 13.11.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.02.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2015 | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.10.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.05.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2010 | AL | 09.01.2013 | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | HR | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | MK | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | SM | 09.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | NO | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | IE | 15.05.2013 | LU | 15.05.2013 | FR | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | GB | 15.05.2016 | TR | 15.05.2016 | [2022/30] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 15.05.2010 | |
AL | 09.01.2013 | ||
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
LU | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
GB | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | HU | 15.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
LU | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
GB | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
LU | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1770015 (GD SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,2,4-23 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2001010332 (BISMARCK GOTTFRIED VON [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-23 * paragraphs [0026] , [0025]; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]WO0194098 (UNIV WARWICK SCIENCE PARK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 6,15-17,22,23 * page 2, lines 16-20 *; | [A]US5783266 (GEHRKE RUSS [US]) [A] 6,15-17,22 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1209083 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 1,18 * abstract * | Opposition | EP0905054 | US5456646 | DE602004002088T | DE3213297 |