EP2216404 - Method of producing an antibody using a cell in which the function of fucose transporter is inhibited [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Masayuki c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 02 /
Iijima, Shigeyuki c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 03 /
Sugo, Izumi c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 04 /
Sekimori, Yasuo c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 05 /
Habu, Kiyoshi c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP | 06 /
Sugimoto, Masamichi c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 200, Kajiwara Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 247-8530 / JP | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Robert Charles D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Dempster, Robert Charles D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10162932.7 | 26.10.2005 | [2010/32] | Priority number, date | WO2004JP19261 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: PCT/JP2004/019261 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216404 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A01H5/00, A01K67/027, A61K39/395, A61P9/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P37/08 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
C12N9/1081 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Antikörpers durch Verwendung einer Zelle mit gehemmter Fucosetransporterfunktion | [2010/32] | English: | Method of producing an antibody using a cell in which the function of fucose transporter is inhibited | [2010/32] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'anticorps basé sur l'utilisation d'une cellule dont la fonction de transporteur du fucose est inhibée | [2010/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05800043.1 / EP1829962 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050800043) is 13.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004110282 (KANDA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [Y] - YAMANE-OHNUKI N ET AL, "Establishment of FUT8 knockout chinese hanster ovary cells: an ideal host cell line for producing completely defucosylated antibodies with enhanced antibody-dependent cellular cytotoxicity", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/BIT.20151, (20040806), vol. 87, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 614 - 622, XP002983758 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20151 | [A] - MORTENSEN R M ET AL, Inactivation of G-protein genes: double knockout in cell lines, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY; HETEROTRIMERIC G PROTEINS; [METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY], ACADEMIC PRESS INC, SAN DIEGO, CA, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0076-6879(94)37075-3, PAGE(S) 356 - 366, (19940101), ISSN 0076-6879, XP008115526 [A] 1-4 *Introduction* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(94)37075-3 | by applicant | EP0239400 | JPH0159878B | EP0404097 | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9220791 | WO9306213 | WO9311236 | WO9311161 | WO9312227 | WO9319172 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | WO9501438 | WO9515388 | WO9602576 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9846777 | JPH11503015 | WO0061739 | WO0233054 | WO2005014651 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, no. 30, pages 26733 - 26740 | - PATE L. SMITH ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (2002), vol. 158, pages 801 - 815 | - SATO, K. ET AL., CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856 | - HUSTON, J. S. ET AL., PROC. NATI ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - CO, M. S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976 | - BETTER, M; HORWITZ, A H., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496 | - PLUCKTHUN, A.; SKERRA, A., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - LAMOYI, E., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 652 - 663 | - ROUSSEAUX, J. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 663 - 669 | - BIRD, R. E.; WALKER, B. W., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 137 | - P. HOLLIGER ET AL., PIOC NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - JOHNSON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 203, pages 88 - 98 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 9, pages 299 - 305 | - PERISIC ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1217 - 1226 | - JOHN ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1999), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 597 - 604 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - ATWELL ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 33, pages 1301 - 1312 | - J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 108, page 945 | - VALLE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 291, pages 358 - 340 | - PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI.. U.S.A, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - PROC. NAT1. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1968), vol. 60, page 1275 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS. RES., (1990), vol. 18, no. 17, page 5322 | - MULLIGAN ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108 | - MIZUSHIMA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5322 | - EBERT, K.M. ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 699 - 702 | - KOHLER, G; MILSTEIN, C., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1981), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46 | - ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1988), vol. 171, page 73 | - YAGI T, PROC. NATL. ACAD.. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 9918 - 9922 | - POPO H, BIOCHEMICAL GENETICS, (1990), vol. 28, pages 299 - 308 | - WEITZHANDLER M ET AL., TOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1994), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 1670 - 1675 | - SCHENK B ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2001), vol. 108, no. 11, pages 1687 - 1695 | - BIGGE J C. ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 230, no. 2, pages 229 - 238 | - WEITZHANDLER M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1994), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 1670 - 1675 | - SCHENK B. ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2001), vol. 108, no. 11, pages 1687 - 1695 | - BIGGE J, C. ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 230, no. 2, pages 229 - 238 | - HIRATA ET AL., FEBS LETTER, (1994), vol. 356, pages 244 - 248 | - NIWA ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 108, pages 193 - 199 | - NIWA ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 108, pages 193 - 200 | - SMITHSON ET AL., MOL IRNNRUNOL., (1999), vol. 36, pages H3 - I24 | - SATO ET AL., MOL LMMUNOL., (1994), pages 371 - 381 | - ROCINSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD- SCI. U S A., (2001), vol. 98, pages 944 - 949 |