EP2253918 - Enclosure For Heat Transfer Devices, Methods Of Manufacture Thereof And Articles Comprising The Same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weaver Jr., Stanton Earl 119 Hemlock Terrace Northville, NY 12134 / US | 02 /
Chauhan, Shakti Singh 125 A3 Hillcrest Village East Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Knobloch, Aaron Jay 12B Fairway Drive Mechanicville, NY 12118 / US | 04 /
Kulkarni, Ambarish Jayant 1187 Hillside Avenue Apt No. 2A22 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 05 /
Varanasi, Kripa Kiran 100 Memorial Drive Apt. 2-23B Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10163002.8 | 17.05.2010 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | US20090470723 | 22.05.2009 Original published format: US 470723 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2253918 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2253918 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F28D15/04, H01L23/427, F28D15/02 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
F28D15/046 (EP,US);
F28D15/0233 (EP,US);
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
F28F2230/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | F28D15/04, H01L23/427 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gehäuse für Wärmeübertragungsvorrichtungen, Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung und dieses enthaltende Artikel | [2010/47] | English: | Enclosure For Heat Transfer Devices, Methods Of Manufacture Thereof And Articles Comprising The Same | [2010/47] | French: | Boîtier pour dispositifs de transfert de chaleur, procédé pour sa fabrication et article l'incorporant | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000353892 (DIAMOND ELECTRIC MFG) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [XY]US2003136550 (TUNG CHAO-NIEN [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10-14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figure - * [Y] 3; | [X]US2004194941 (LARRIEU JEAN-MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-14 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraphs [0076] , [0099]; figure - *; | [X]US2007107875 (LEE YOUNG-DUCK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-14* paragraphs [0067] , [0068] , [0080] , [0081]; figure -; claims 24-26,28 *; | [X]US2008078531 (CHUNG MING-TE [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032]; figure -; claims 16,19,20 * | Examination | US2005280162 |