EP2226118 - Catalyst loading method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/36] | Catalyst loading system | ||
[2013/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unidense Technology Gmbh Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse 2 01987 Schwarzheide / DE | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Peter Friedenstraße 5 01945, Schwarzbach / DE | 02 /
Markowski, Peter Naumburger Straße 226 06217, Merseburg / DE | 03 /
Kruopys, Petras Friedensstrasse 5 01945, Schwarzbach / DE | [2013/30] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
Richter, Peter Friedenstraße 5 01945, Schwarzbach / DE | ||
02 /
Markowski, Peter Naumburger Straße 226 06217, Merseburg / DE | |||
03 /
Kruopys, Petras Friedensstrasse 5 01945, Schwarzbach / DE | Representative(s) | Carlsohn, Alexander Riechelmann & Carlsohn Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wiener Strasse 91 01219 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Carlsohn, Alexander Patentanwälte Riechelmann & Carlsohn Wiener Strasse 91 01219 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Carlsohn, Alexander Patentanwälte Riechelmann & Carlsohn Wiener Strasse 91 01219 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 10163038.2 | 16.11.2009 | [2010/36] | Priority number, date | US20080116140P | 19.11.2008 Original published format: US 116140 P | US20090617461 | 12.11.2009 Original published format: US 617461 | US20090599777 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: US 599777 | [2010/36] | Previously filed application, date | EP20090176146 | 16.11.2009 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226118 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226118 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J8/06, B65G69/16 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
B01J8/002 (EP,US);
B01J8/0015 (US);
B01J8/003 (EP,US);
B01J8/06 (EP,US);
B65G69/16 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00752 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00778 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Katalysatorladeverfahren | [2013/02] | English: | Catalyst loading method | [2013/02] | French: | Procédé de chargement de catalyseur | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/36] | Katalysatorladesystem | ||
Former [2010/36] | Catalyst loading system | ||
Former [2010/36] | Système de chargement de catalyseur | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 15.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09176146.0 / EP2191889 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090176146) is 30.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2009 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | HR | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | MK | 24.07.2013 | MT | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | SM | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.10.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IE | 16.11.2013 | LU | 16.11.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MK | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.11.2013 | ||
LU | 16.11.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MK | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.11.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.11.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.11.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 24.07.2013 | |
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 24.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4461327 (MAGIN RUDOLF [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [XA]US2002129642 (JOHNS CLIFFORD L [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [XA]US6981422 (COMARDO MATHIS P [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [A]EP1749568 (COTA ALDO [DE]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0035] , [0039] , [0042]; figures 1,7; claims 1,20-30 * |