EP2221112 - Liner with improved seal for the paint supply cup of a spray gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosmyna, Michael J 2442 Shoreland Avenue Toledo, OH 43611 / US | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/05] |
Former [2010/34] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10163477.2 | 01.06.2005 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | US20040865621 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 865621 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221112 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221112 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | [2010/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221112 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/24 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
B05B7/2478 (EP,US);
B05B7/24 (KR);
B05B7/2408 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Innenbecher mit verbesserter Abdichtung für den Fliessbecher einer Sprühpistole | [2010/34] | English: | Liner with improved seal for the paint supply cup of a spray gun | [2010/34] | French: | Garniture comprenant un joint amelioré pour le reservoir d'alimentation en peinture d'un pistolet pulverisateur | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05758476.5 / EP1753541 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050758476) is 09.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2005 | AT | 01.02.2012 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | IE | 01.06.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | LU | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
LU | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 01.06.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3401842 (MORRISON LESTER G) [A] 1,3* column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH06335643 (HORIE KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]WO03045575 (RUDA MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 12, line 12 - line 18; figure 3 * | by applicant | US5582350 | FR2798868 | US6588681 | US6698670 | US20040760079 |