EP2388880 - Switching assembly for restricting voltage and connection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinelt, Klaus / Tafelackerstr. 6 90766, Fürth / DE | 02 /
Volkmann, Hans / Sonnenweg 4 90559, Burgthann / DE | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 10163567.0 | 21.05.2010 | [2011/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388880 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
H02H9/042 (EP);
H02H9/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Spannungsbegrenzung und Anschlussvorrichtung | [2011/47] | English: | Switching assembly for restricting voltage and connection device | [2011/47] | French: | Agencement de commutation pour la limitation de tension et dispositif de raccordement | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4068281 (HARNDEN JR JOHN D) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 17; figures 4,5 *; | [X]DE102004063708 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraph [0038]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0044] * | by applicant | DE10124683 |