EP2266431 - Make-up kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toly Products (UK) Limited Argyll House, 2nd Floor 23 Brook Street Kingston Upon Thames Surrey KT1 2BN / GB | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Philippe Toly Products Ltd B6 Bulebel Industrial Estate ZTN 08, Zetjun / MT | [2012/05] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
Parker, Philippe Toly Products Ltd B6 Bulebel Industrial Estate ZTN 08, Zetjun / MT | Representative(s) | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | ||
Former [2010/52] | Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10163714.8 | 24.05.2010 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | GB20090010732 | 22.06.2009 Original published format: GB 0910732 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2266431 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2266431 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A45D33/26, A45D40/24 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A45D40/24 (EP,US);
A45D33/20 (EP,US);
A45D33/26 (EP,US);
B65D1/36 (GB);
B65D11/12 (GB);
B65D21/0219 (GB);
B65D21/0223 (GB);
B65D21/023 (EP,US);
B65D21/0235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] |
Former [2010/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Make-up-Kit | [2010/52] | English: | Make-up kit | [2010/52] | French: | Kit de maquillage | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2010 | AL | 01.02.2012 | AT | 01.02.2012 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | HR | 01.02.2012 | IT | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MK | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | SM | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | NO | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | ES | 12.05.2012 | IE | 24.05.2012 | LU | 24.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AL | 01.02.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2012 | ||
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
SM | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
LU | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 01.02.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2012 | ||
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 01.02.2012 | |
AT | 01.02.2012 | ||
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 24.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2077219 (CONNER BENJAMIN F) [X] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3003839 (ELI BLOOM, et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US3188157 (RAND PAUL D) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1539870 (NAGATA T) [X] 1-3,7 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6302120 (KUO CHEN-HUI [TW]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 12; figures 2-6 *; | [X]JP2004001808 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2896387 (CATHALA FRANCOIS HENRI [FR]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1F *; | [A]US2009044827 (ZILBER CHRISTINA [US], et al) [A] 1-8* figures 1A, 1B, 5A-5D * | Examination | GB1203403 | GB2136399 | GB2367551 |