EP2390009 - Metering arrangement for dispensing metered quantities of liquid from a deformable container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scandinavian Amenities A/S Stamholmen 111 2650 Hvidovre / DK | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lolk, So̸ren / Skolevej 4 8362, Ho̸rning / DK | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Holme Patent A/S Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 10164451.6 | 31.05.2010 | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390009 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B65D83/14, A47K5/12 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
A47K5/1202 (EP,US);
B05B11/007 (EP,US);
B05B11/0072 (EP,US);
B05B11/047 (EP,US);
G01F11/02 (US);
G01F11/28 (EP,US);
B05B11/0075 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung zur Ausgabe von abgemessenen Flüssigkeitsmengen aus einem verformbaren Behälter | [2011/48] | English: | Metering arrangement for dispensing metered quantities of liquid from a deformable container | [2011/48] | French: | Mesure d'agencement pour fournir des quantités mesurées de liquide à partir d'un récipient déformable | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 07.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010052390 (WOZNA PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1-5,8-15 * page 6, line 29 - page 17, line 20; figure - * [Y] 8 [I] 6,7; | [X]DE9412712U (WEENER PLASTIK GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9-11,15 * page 5, line 3 - page 11, line 17; figure - *; | [XYI]US4049162 (YULE LANCE S) [X] 1-5,9-11,15 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 47; figure - * [Y] 8 [I] 6,7; | [A]US3640435 (MORRIS EARL L) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US2778543 (URLAUB GEORGE S) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 22; figure - *; | [A]US2004074929 (YQUEL JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0098]; figure - * | by applicant | EP1317383 | EP1084669 | WO2006123168 |