EP2221008 - Knotless suture anchor for soft tissue repair and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Burg, Erik 16417 Peacock Lane Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
Cohen, Nathaniel 231 Rosalie Court Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 03 /
Feezor, Christopher 1957 Trenton Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 04 /
Cheng, Christopher T. 260 West Dana Street Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Van den Burg, Erik 16417 Peacock Lane LOS GATOS, CA 95032 / US | ||
02 /
Cohen, Nathaniel 231 Rosalie Court LOS GATOS, CA 95032 / US | |||
03 /
Feezor, Christopher 1957 Trenton Drive SAN JOSE, CA 95124 / US | |||
04 /
Cheng, Christopher T. 260 West Dana Street MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/34] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10164521.6 | 08.09.2009 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | US20080206643 | 08.09.2008 Original published format: US 206643 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2221008 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2221008 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221008 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0404 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0438 (EP,US);
A61B2017/045 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0451 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0453 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3015 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2164 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Knotenlose Nahtverankerung zur Weichgewebereparatur und Verwendungsverfahren | [2010/34] | English: | Knotless suture anchor for soft tissue repair and method of use | [2010/34] | French: | Ancre de suture sans noeuds pour la réparation de tissus mous et procédé d'utilisation | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09169742.5 / EP2160983 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090169742) is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2009 | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MK | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | SM | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | LU | 08.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007005068 (SKLAR JOSEPH H [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0007] , [0039]; figure 26 *; | [A]US2008086138 (STONE KEVIN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007276412 (CATANESE JOSEPH III [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0231]; figure 9I *; | [A]US2008021474 (BONUTTI PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0515] , [0516]; figure 197 *; | [A]WO2008011417 (KAPLAN LEE D [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5948000 (LARSEN SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2006200199 (BONUTTI PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - ROCKWOOD C. ET AL., THE SHOULDER, SAUNDERS, (2004), pages 820 - 821 | - YAMAGUCHI, K. ET AL., J. SHOULDER ELBOW SURG., (2001), vol. 10, pages 199 - 203 | - BISHOP J. ET AL., "Cuff integrity after arthroscopic versus open rotator cuff repair: A prospective study", J. SHOULDER ELBOW SURG., (2006), vol. 15, pages 290 - 299 | - GALATZ, L. ET AL., "The outcome and repair integrity of completely arthroscopically repaired large and massive rotator cuff tears", J. BONE JOINT SURG. AM., (2004), vol. 86A, pages 219 - 24 | - CUMINS, C.A. ET AL., "Mode of failure for rotator cuff repair with suture anchors identified at revision surgery", J. SHOULDER ELBOW SURG., (200303), vol. L2, no. 2, pages 128 - 33 | - BURKHART, S.S. ET AL., "A stepwise approach to arthroscopic rotator cuff repair based on biomechanical principles", ARTHROSCOPY, (200001), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 82 - 90 | - KIM, D. ET AL., "Biomechanical comparison of a single-row versus double row suture anchor technique for rotator cuff repair", AM. J. SPORTS MED., (2006), vol. 34, page 407 |