EP2228188 - Process and apparatus for underwater pelletization of polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/37] | Underwater Melt Cutter and Process for Underwater Melt Cutting of a Polymer | ||
[2010/38] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, KY 41042 / US | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Richard, Alan 102 Bellfield Court Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 02 /
Royer, Dennis, Jack 200 Crestline Drive Kennett Square, PA 19348 / US | 03 /
Waggoner, Marion, Glen 304 Buttonwood Road Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner - Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10164697.4 | 28.07.2004 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | US20030491003P | 30.07.2003 Original published format: US 491003 P | US20040563941P | 21.04.2004 Original published format: US 563941 P | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2228188 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2228188 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/06, B01J2/20, B29C47/30 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (KR,US);
B01J2/20 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/582 (EP);
B29B7/823 (EP);
B29B7/826 (EP);
B29B9/02 (KR);
B29C31/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0027 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERWASSERGRANULIERUNG VON POLYMEREN | [2010/38] | English: | Process and apparatus for underwater pelletization of polymers | [2010/38] | French: | Procédé et appareil de boulettage de polymères | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/37] | Unterwasser-Schmelzschneider und Verfahren zum Unterwasserschmelzschneiden eines Polymers | ||
Former [2010/37] | Underwater Melt Cutter and Process for Underwater Melt Cutting of a Polymer | ||
Former [2010/37] | Scie sous-marine et procédé de découpe sous-marine d'un polymère | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04779507.5 / EP1651410 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040779507) is 01.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3516120 (BRAUN SIEGFRIED, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]DE1964884 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4138208 (HECKEROTH EARL T) [Y] 2,7 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 34; figure 2 *; | [IY]WO8101980 (TRW INC [US]) [I] 1,3,4,6,8,9,11 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 9 * * page 10, line 8 - page 10, line 27 * [Y] 2,7; | [A]JPS59152808 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4678423 (BERTOLOTTI FRANCO [IT]) [A] 1,3,6,8,11 * the whole document * * in particular ** column 2, line 46 - column 2, line 63 *; | [A]EP0246921 (ROGERS TOOLS [US]) [A] 1,3,6,8,11 * the whole document * * in particular * * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 2 *; | [A]EP0302621 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH05253997 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]US5679380 (MUNZ RAINER [DE], et al) [I] 1,3,4,6,8,9,11 * the whole document * * in particular * * column 3, line 49 - column 3, line 55 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A] - HUNOLD D, "INDIREKTES BEHEIZEN UND KUEHLEN", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL-HANSER-VERLAG MUENCHEN, (199804), vol. 88, no. 4, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 520 - 522, XP000765246 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2918701 | US3749539 | US4728276 | JPH05253997 |