EP2392495 - External rear view mirror with air guidance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. Le Dôme 2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmierer, Arne Silcher Str. 43 73230, Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Negel, Raimund Austraße 13 72669, Unterensingen / DE | 03 /
Herrmann, Andreas In der Au 29 71364, Winnenden-Baach / DE | 04 /
Szmolenszki, Istvan Bühlgarten 21 71409, Schwaikheim / DE | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 10164964.8 | 04.06.2010 | [2011/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392495 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2392495 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
B60R1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Title | German: | Außenrückblickspiegel mit Luftführung | [2011/49] | English: | External rear view mirror with air guidance | [2011/49] | French: | Rétroviseur extérieur doté d'un guidage de l'air | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 25.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2010 | AL | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | IE | 04.06.2013 | LU | 04.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
LU | 04.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 04.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102005031078 (SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,13,14 * paragraph [0035]; figure 1 * [Y] 4,11,12; | [Y]DE102005047189 (SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0031]; figure 9 *; | [YD]DE19743107 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [YD] 11 * abstract *; | [YD]DE10351857 (OPEL EISENACH GMBH [DE]) [YD] 12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10351857 | DE19632620 | DE19743107 |