EP2258633 - Bottom-dump waste container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eyraud, Marc / 8 parc de la Bérangère 92210, SAINT-CLOUD / FR | 02 /
Troton, Jean / 349 Route de Rignieu 01150, CHAZEY SUR AIN / FR | 03 /
Serrault, Jean-Pierre / 27 Place Henri Neveu 92700, COLOMBES / FR | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Eyraud, Marc 8 parc de la Bérangère 92210, SAINT-CLOUD / FR | ||
02 /
Troton, Jean 349 Route de Rignieu 01150, CHAZEY SUR AIN / FR | |||
03 /
Serrault, Jean-Pierre 27 Place Henri Neveu 92700, COLOMBES / FR | Representative(s) | Tarrère, Blandine LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Tarrère, Blandine Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/49] | Tarrère, Blandine Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10164974.7 | 04.06.2010 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | FR20090053706 | 04.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0953706 | [2010/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258633 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258633 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/12 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
B65F1/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Müllbehälter mit Bodenentleerung | [2010/49] | English: | Bottom-dump waste container | [2010/49] | French: | Conteneur de déchets avec fond ouvrant | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 13.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2010 | AL | 30.05.2012 | AT | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | IT | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MK | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | SM | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | IE | 04.06.2012 | LU | 04.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AL | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
SM | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.06.2012 | ||
LU | 04.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9307098U (L. RÜHLAND) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2817476 (MILLS JR EDWARD K) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 12 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2577904 (LOOS REMY [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 2 - line 9 * |