EP2273223 - Heat exchanger for a shower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hei-Tech B.V. Phileas Foggstraat 145 7825 AW Emmen / NL | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidemans, Jacob Middenraai 49 7912 TH Nieuweroord / NL | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10165128.9 | 07.06.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | NL20092002988 | 09.06.2009 Original published format: NL 2002988 | [2011/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273223 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/06, F24D17/00 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
F28D1/06 (EP);
F24D17/0005 (EP);
Y02B30/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher für Duscheinrichtung | [2011/02] | English: | Heat exchanger for a shower | [2011/02] | French: | Échangeur de chaleur pour douche | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2014 | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20013530U (HILBERT HOOGESTRAAT & SOHN GMB [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2389373 (BANCROFT PAUL [GB]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]NL1025765C (NIJHOF JERED [NL]) [A] 1-6* page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 22 *; | [A]FR2868796 (CAO FAO SOLUTIONS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006041320 (MCGREGOR GARTH KENNEDY [NZ]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]DE202007006050U (DALLMER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0 26] - [0033]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE202006014959U (VIEGA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; figures 1-10 * | by applicant | NL1009927 | NL1014030C | NL1028249C |