EP2228220 - Liquid ejecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koizumi, Yoshihiro Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
Koizumi, Yoshihiro Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10165210.5 | 18.03.2004 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | JP20030073600 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003073600 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228220 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228220 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucker | [2010/37] | English: | Liquid ejecting apparatus | [2010/37] | French: | Dispositif de projection d'un jet de liquide | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04721647.8 / EP1604830 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040721647) is 01.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2004 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | IT | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | ES | 15.10.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | IE | 18.03.2013 | LU | 18.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2001063170 (CANON KK) [AD] 1-6 * figures 1,2a,2b * * paragraph [0021] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2001040610 (KURATA TETSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]EP1231062 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2,6 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0066] *; | [A]US2002140789 (TAJIMA HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2,4,10 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] * | by applicant | JP2001232808 | JP2002211003 |