EP2244255 - Information recording medium, recording apparatus, reproduction apparatus, recording method, and reproduction method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoji, Mamoru Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Takashi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Motoshi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Ueda, Hiroshi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Yamamoto, Yoshikazu Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Nakamura, Atsushi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 10165630.4 | 20.01.2003 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | JP20020013493 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002013493 | JP20020056479 | 01.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002056479 | JP20020320444 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002320444 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2244255 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2244255 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24079 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US);
G11B2020/122 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1227 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1275 (EP,US);
G11B2220/235 (EP,US);
G11B7/24082 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, HU, NL [2010/43] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung, Wiedergabevorrichtung, Aufzeichnungsverfahren und Wiedergabeverfahren | [2010/43] | English: | Information recording medium, recording apparatus, reproduction apparatus, recording method, and reproduction method | [2010/43] | French: | Support d'enregistrement d'informations, appareil d'enregistrement, appareil de reproduction, procédé d'enregistrement et procédé de reproduction | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03701813.2 / EP1468417 | EP08153207.9 / EP1950748 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030701813) is 25.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5210734 (SAKURAI YUKIMITSU [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5388105 (TAKAGI YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]EP0718831 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0813189 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5850382 (KOISHI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0981130 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1006515 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |