EP2239904 - Apparatus and method for transmitting and receiving a signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Woo Suk LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-dong, Seocho-Gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Moon, Sang Chul LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-dong, Seocho-Gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10165887.0 | 03.06.2009 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | US20080107329P | 21.10.2008 Original published format: US 107329 P | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239904 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2239904 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
H04L27/2626 (EP,US);
H03M13/1102 (US);
H04B1/38 (US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/2627 (US);
H04L27/2647 (US);
H04L27/2698 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04J2011/0009 (US);
H04L27/26132 (EP,US);
H04L27/26134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Senden und Empfangen eines Signals | [2010/41] | English: | Apparatus and method for transmitting and receiving a signal | [2010/41] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la transmission et la réception d'un signal | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 15.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09161842.1 / EP2180648 | Divisional application(s) | EP11162308.8 / EP2360884 | EP15164121.4 / EP2928102 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090161842) is 09.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | MK | 25.05.2011 | MT | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | IE | 03.06.2011 | LU | 03.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | NO | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MK | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
NO | 25.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008225996 (VARE JANI [FI], et al) [I] 1,6,10,13* paragraph [0078] *; | [I] - Frame structure chanel coding and modulation for a second generation digital terrestrail television broadcasting system (DVB-T2) - DVB document A122- TM 3980 Rev. 5, DVB PROJECT, (20080601), XP002545919 [I] 1,6,10,13 * page 63 - page 64 * * page 75 - page 76 * |