EP2265013 - Transmission of content to a client device comprising at least one decoding module and one security module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states France Télécom 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states France Telecom 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vivolo, Olivier 6 rue du Docteur Yves Louvigné 35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
Becker, Claudia 47 rue Vasselot 35000 Rennes / FR | [2011/22] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
VIVOLO, Olivier 6 rue du Docteur Yves Louvigné 35000 Rennes / FR | ||
02 /
BECKER, Claudia 47 rue Vasselot 35000 Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Stephann, Valérie Annabelle, et al Orange R&D / PiV / Pi 38-40, rue du Général-Leclerc 92794 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Stephann, Valérie Annabelle, et al France Telecom R&D / PiV / Pi 38-40, rue du Général-Leclerc 92794 Issy Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10166001.7 | 15.06.2010 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | FR20090054201 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0954201 | [2010/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265013 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
H04N7/161 (EP);
H04H60/23 (EP);
H04N21/21 (EP);
H04N21/23 (EP);
H04N21/2585 (EP);
H04N21/26606 (EP);
H04N21/4181 (EP);
H04N21/4182 (EP);
H04N21/4623 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Datenübertragung zu einem Kundengerät, das mit mindestens einem Dekodiermodul und einem Sicherheitsmodul ausgestattet ist | [2010/51] | English: | Transmission of content to a client device comprising at least one decoding module and one security module | [2010/51] | French: | Transmission de contenu vers un équipement client comportant au moins un module de décodage et un module de sécurité | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 27.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/32] | 20.03.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004101138 (REVITAL DAN [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 9, paragraph 112 * * page 14, paragraph 153 *; | [X]FR2850822 (CANAL PLUS TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * pages 3-4 * * page 6, lines 26,27; figure 1 * * page 13, lines 8-20 *; | [A]EP1631085 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 8, paragraph 63 *; | [A]US2006126839 (KOIKE MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* page 5, paragraph 47 *; | [A]US2007180231 (MORTEN GLENN A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 61 * | Examination | FR2866773 |