EP2267588 - Virtual control station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Richard E. 13834 241st Street SE Kent, WA 98042 / US | 02 /
Kesterson, Bryan P. 22955 130th Place SE Kent, WA 98031 / US | 03 /
Boutros, Ramzy 27717 215th Place SE Maple Valley, WA 98038 / US | 04 /
Hornsby, Mary E. 20647 6th Avenue SW Normandy Park, WA 98166 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10166548.7 | 18.06.2010 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US20090491339 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: US 491339 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267588 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267588 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/01, A47C7/70 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
A47C7/624 (EP,US);
A47C7/70 (EP,US);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | G06F3/048, G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Virtuelle Steuerungsstation | [2010/52] | English: | Virtual control station | [2010/52] | French: | Station de commande virtuelle | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 06.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2016 | 07.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/22] | 12.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5318018 (PUMA SAMUEL C [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * column 15, line 31 - line 36; figure 2 * * column 16, line 51 - line 56; figure 2 * * column 20, line 20 - line 25 *; | [A]US5490784 (CARMEIN DAVID E E [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 33 - column 4, line 42; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5612718 (BRYAN JED A [US]) [Y] 9-12 * column 12, line 34 - line 64; figures 30,31 * * column 1, line 15 - line 19 * * column 3, line 42 - line 57 *; | [A]WO2004030401 (MM GEAR CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 3-5 * page 6, line 1 - line 4; figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2008208396 (CAIROLA DOMENICO [IT], et al) [X] 1,6,8,13,14 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0047]; figure 4 * [Y] 9-12 [I] 2-5,7,15; | [A] - Karl Pfleger, "Karl Pfleger's Armrest Mounted Split Keyboard Setup", (20031107), URL: http://www.ksl.stanford.edu/people/kpfleger/ergo/, (20140526), XP002724985 [A] 9-12 * the whole document * | Examination | US2003156144 | US6765569 | US7301648 | US2008285805 |