EP2399621 - Drip chamber with ventilation valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codan Holding GmbH Stig Husted-Andersen Strasse 11 23738 Lensahn / DE | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüger, Peter Schulstraße 11 23738 Damlos / DE | 02 /
Ahrens, Helge CODAN Holding GmbH Bischof-Bertold-Straße 2h 24223, Schwentinental / DE | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 10167402.6 | 25.06.2010 | [2011/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399621 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2399621 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, // A61M5/38 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/1411 (EP);
A61M2202/049 (EP);
A61M2205/7527 (EP);
A61M2205/7536 (EP);
A61M5/36 (EP);
A61M5/38 (EP);
A61M5/385 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61M5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2011/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Tropfkammer mit Lüftungsventil | [2011/52] | English: | Drip chamber with ventilation valve | [2011/52] | French: | Chambre de goutte-à-goutte dotée d'une soupape d'aération | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2009259199 (LAMPROPOULOS FRED P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0046] - [0048] , [0060] - [0064]; figure - * [A] 12-14 [Y] 9 [I] 3-7; | [IAY]US5242424 (CHEN YUEH-HORNG [TW]) [I] 1-8,10,11,15 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 6; figure - * [A] 12-14 [Y] 9; | [Y]WO0141844 (TEVA MEDICAL IND LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 9 * page 2, lines 14-16 * * page 4; figure - *; | [A]US6336916 (BORMANN THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 3,4,8 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 9; figure - *; | [A]DE19748497 (OHMEDA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 10 * column 4, lines 7-17; figure - * |