EP2280488 - Transmission and reception apparatus for digital signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20864 Agrate Brianza / IT | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza MI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giombanco, Salvatore Via Anapo, 48 96010, Cassaro (SR) / IT | 02 /
Lombardo, Giovanni Via Goldoni, 5 91011, Alcampo (TP) / IT | 03 /
Tumminaro, Salvatore Corso Vittorio Emanuele, 56 93010, Marianopoli (CL) / IT | 04 /
Marino, Filippo Via dei Giardini, 5 95030, Tremestieri (CT) / IT | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico Viale Lombardia 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Mittler, Enrico Viale Lombardia 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10167420.8 | 25.06.2010 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01148 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091148 | [2011/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280488 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H04L7/033, G06F13/38 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
H04B1/16 (EP,US);
H04L25/0264 (EP,US);
H04L25/0268 (EP,US);
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04L7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Übertragungs- und Empfangseinrichtung für digitale Signale | [2011/05] | English: | Transmission and reception apparatus for digital signals | [2011/05] | French: | Appareil de transmission et réception pour signaux numériques | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5448571 (HONG JU-HI J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 10 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 4-7; | [A]US2006234405 (BEST SCOTT C [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2002075981 (TANG BENJAMIM [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0037] - [0039] * * figures 5-7 * | by applicant | US2008311862 |