EP2278721 - Apparatus, system, and method for sharing antenna and feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUE, Ling Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Taoyuan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CAI, Dantao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
MENG, Zhixiao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
YUE, Ling Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Taoyuan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
CAI, Dantao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
MENG, Zhixiao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10167814.2 | 30.06.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | CN200910108544 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: CN200910108544 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278721 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2278721 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, H04W88/08 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H04B1/0057 (EP);
H04W88/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, System und Verfahren zur gemeinsamen Nutzung einer Antenne und eines Speisers | [2011/04] | English: | Apparatus, system, and method for sharing antenna and feeder | [2011/04] | French: | Appareil, système et procédé de partage d'antenne et dispositif d'alimentation | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 06.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12184414.6 / EP2541779 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2010 | AL | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | SM | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | IE | 30.06.2013 | LU | 30.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
LU | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CN101459986 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * figures 1,6,7 * [A] 3-5; | WO2010072173 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]WO2007111545 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 8 - page 9, line 13; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1294045 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2008128403 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 7 *; | EP2086244 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |