EP2273382 - Device and method for determining signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vannucci, James 5212 Forest View Drive McDonald PA 15057 / US | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10168272.2 | 02.07.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | US20090459596 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: US 459596 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2273382 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2273382 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/12 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G06F17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Signalbestimmung | [2011/02] | English: | Device and method for determining signals | [2011/02] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de détermination de signaux | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/29] | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]US2010011041 (VANNUCCI JAMES [US]) [XP] 1-4,6-9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 5,10; | [XPI]US2010011045 (VANNUCCI JAMES [US]) [XP] 1-4,6-9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 5,10; | [A] - ALONSO P ET AL, "An efficient and stable parallel solution for non-symmetric Toeplitz linear systems", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING FOR COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE (VECPAR 2004), 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, VALENCIA, SPAIN, JUNE 28-30, 2004, REVISED SELECTED AND INVITED PAPERS, (2005), vol. 3402, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, pages 685 - 698, XP002521621 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - NG M K ET AL, "Scientific applications of iterative Toeplitz solvers", (1996), pages 1 - 18, WORKSHOP TOEPLITZ MATRICES: STRUCTURES, ALGORITHMS AND APPLICATIONS, 9-14 SEPTEMBER 1996, CORTONA, ITALY, URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/old/620822.html, (20090330), XP002521622 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US6448923 | US6545639 | US6091361 | US2006114148 | US6567034 | US6044336 | US6646593 | US6438204 | US6038197 | US2006020401 | US2003048861 | US2007133814 | US6064689 | US2004141480 | US2005281214 | US2006018398 | US2006034398 | US6005916 | US2008107319 | US4982162 | US6043652 | US6487524 | US2006040706 | US2005271016 | US2006013479 |