EP2269859 - Planetary wheel end assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varela, Tomaz Dopico 7129 Tottenham Shelby Township, MI 48317 / US | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10168332.4 | 02.07.2010 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | US20090496761 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: US 496761 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269859 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/04, F16H1/28 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
F16H1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Planetengetrieberadantrieb | [2011/01] | English: | Planetary wheel end assembly | [2011/01] | French: | Entraînement de roue à engrenage planétaire | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0840095 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,15 * figure 6 *; | [X]US5356351 (HVOLKA DUSAN J [US]) [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * column 2, lines 12-27,51-56 * * column 3, lines 3-39 * * figure 1 *; | [X]SU1207823 (MI AVTOMOBILNYJ Z [SU]) [X] 1-3,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US5088967 (OPITZ ANDOR [HU], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 43 * * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 11 * * figure 3 * [I] 14; | [A]FR509275 (RENAULT LOUIS [FR]) [A] 1,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4315556 (TIMONEY SEAMUS G) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 18-42 * * column 4, lines 11,12 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2055714 (GKN AXLES) [A] 1 * the whole document * |