EP2284455 - Tracking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viessmann Photovoltaik GmbH Viessmannstrasse 1 35108 Allendorf (Eder) / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imkamp, Gerd Im Lohden 19 33334 Gütersloh / DE | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Michael Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Wolf & Wolf Hirschstrasse 7 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 10169035.2 | 09.07.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | DE20092005141U | 14.08.2009 Original published format: DE 202009005141 U | [2011/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2284455 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2284455 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/54, H01L31/042, F24J2/52 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
H02S20/10 (EP);
F24S25/12 (EP);
F24S30/452 (EP);
H02S20/32 (EP);
F24S25/10 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | F24J2/54, H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nachführvorrichtung | [2011/07] | English: | Tracking device | [2011/07] | French: | Dispositif de poursuite | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5191875 (EDLING JACK V [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 61; figures 1,8,9 *; | [X]DE202006015917U (NIESING ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figure 6 *; | [X]EP1995535 (CANO MESEGUER TEODORO DOMINGO [ES], et al) [X] 1,7-10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO0066947 (POND RICHARD JAMES [GB]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 20; figures 2a,2b,7a,7b * [A] 2-10; | [XA]US4215410 (RODRIAN JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * column 5, line 14 - column 7, line 17; figure 1 * [A] 6-8; | [X]DE20021890U (SWEMERS PETER [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,10 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0031477 (SOLAR ENERGY SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,7,9 * | by applicant | DE10192244 |