EP2282030 - Spray system, power augmentation system for engine containing spray system and method of humidifying air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gas Turbine Efficiency Sweden AB Datavägen 9A 175 27 Järfälle / SE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bland, Robert 1272 Regal Oak Court Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/06] | Epping, Wilhelm Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10169096.4 | 09.07.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US20090492666 | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 492666 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282030 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2282030 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/30, F02C7/143, F02C7/057 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
F02C3/30 (EP,US);
F02C7/057 (EP,US);
F02C7/143 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/06] | F02C3/30, F02C7/143 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sprühsystem, Leistungssteigerungssystem für Motor, der das Sprühsystem enthält, und Luftbefeuchtungsverfahren | [2011/06] | English: | Spray system, power augmentation system for engine containing spray system and method of humidifying air | [2011/06] | French: | Système de pulvérisation, système d'augmentation de la puissance pour moteur contenant le système de pulvérisation et procédé d'humidification de l'air | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 19.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9743530 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-26 * page 2, lines 17-29; figures 1,3,4 * * page 7, lines 30-36 * * pages 26,27 *; | [X]JP2001234755 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract *; | [X]DE10256193 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD BADEN [CH]) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005102995 (CARBERG WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0005] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1903188 (GAS TURBINE EFFICIENCY SWEDEN [SE]) [A] 1-26* paragraphs [0005] , [0043] , [0049] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 2-4,9 * |